DC B23-0533 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0488 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13904
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0488 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13904
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-533 designates the 2400 block of 4th Street, N.W., in Ward 1, as Lucy Diggs Slowe Way.
Title
Lucy Diggs Slowe Way Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0488 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13904 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0488 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0533 |
2020-09-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0533 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |