DC B23-0543 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-543 requires continuing education for licensed health professionals on the subject of suicide risk assessment, treatment, and management to provide comprehensive care for at-risk patients. Training includes 2 credits of evidence-based training in suicide prevention, assessment and screening, treatment, management, and postvention.
Title
Suicide Prevention Continuing Education Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0543 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-11-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0543 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43622/Introduction/B23-0543-Introduction.pdf |