DC B23-0545 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-11 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-11 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-545 provides remediation for subcontractors in the event of non-payment by contractors or higher-tier subcontractors. It requires that payments be made to subcontractors within 7 days of receipt of funds paid to contractor from the District agency. It also standardizes program compliance verification with a site visit, creates an anonymous violation reporting mechanism, and incentivizes small business subcontracting. Among other things it also closes loopholes to prevent program abuse.
Title
Small Business Procurement Reform Omnibus Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0545 |
2020-09-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0545 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2019-11-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0545 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43624/Introduction/B23-0545-Introduction.pdf |