DC B23-0546 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0544 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00092
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-546 preserves the regulatory authority of states to protect public health and safety through the current system of state licensure of physical therapy. It authorizes a state to allow a licensee from another member state to practice as a physical therapist or work as a physical therapist assistant in the remote state under its laws and rules. The practice of physical therapy occurs in the members state where the patient is located at the time of the encounter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Physical Therapy Compact Approval Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01CouncilAct A23-0544 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00092
2020-12-23CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-12-22CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0544
2020-12-10CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 24, 2020
2020-12-01CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-11-30CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-11-10CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0546
2020-11-10CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-10-14CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-10-07CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0546
2019-12-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-12-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-11-29CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-11-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0546 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-11-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback