DC B23-0562 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0529 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0529 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-562 orders the legal closing of a 15 foot wide public alley in Square 5860 abutting lots 1020, 1025 through 1031, 1037 and P231/8 and Square 5600 lot 800 in Ward 8.
Title
Closing of Columbian Quarter Alley in Square 5860 Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-25 | Council | Act A23-0529 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14768 |
2020-12-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0529 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0562 |
2020-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0562 Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-11-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |