DC B23-0565 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0134, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0134, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-565 requires both minors and adults to receive a medical clearance from an otolaryngologist and receive a hearing test evaluation before an entity can fit, offer for sale, or sell a hearing aid to them. Adults may also receive clearance from a licensed physician.
Title
Hearing Aid Sales Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Law L23-0134, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13199 |
2020-09-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-08-21 | Council | Act A23-0388 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9883 |
2020-08-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-12 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0388 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-07-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0565 |
2020-01-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-01-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-12-13 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0565 Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-12-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |