DC B23-0570 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-570 requires the Department of Employment Services ("DOES") to permit organizations to provide DOES with qualified candidates for inclusion in the First Source Register. The register was established to ensure that District residents are given priority for new jobs created by municipal financing and development programs. It requires DOES to proactively identify individuals who are "hard to serve" and to develop standard operating procedures for its role in First Source. Among other things, it requires that the workforce intermediary program be used exclusively for First Source projects or contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First Source Resident Employment Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-11-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-11-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-02CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-12-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0570 Published in the DC Register
2019-12-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2019-12-03CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback