DC B23-0571 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0575 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0575 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-571 makes the independent procurement authority for the Health Benefit Exchange Authority permanent.
Title
Health Benefit Exchange Authority Independent Procurement Authority Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0575 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001108 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0575 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0571 |
2020-10-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0571 |
2020-01-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0571 Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-12-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |