DC B23-0580 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0507 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0507 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-580 closes a portion of a public alley system in Square 2892, bounded by Lamont Street, Georgia Avenue, Kenyon Street, and Sherman Avenue in Northwest Washington, D.C., in Ward 1.
Title
Closing of a Public in Square 2892, S.O. 19-47478, Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Council | Act A23-0507 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14403 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0507 |
2020-11-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0580 |
2020-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0580 Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-12-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |