DC B23-0601 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-601 clarifies the implementation of the condominium warranty against structural defects and transfers the administration of the warranty to the Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs. DCRA must maintain an online record of the warranty security amounts and make the information searchable on the web by the public.
Title
Condominium Warranty Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0601 Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2020-01-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0601 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43938/Introduction/B23-0601-Introduction.pdf |