DC B23-0641 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0578 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0578 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-641 allows the Mayor to set temporary parking rates in a performance parking zone for a set duration of time when anticipating a special event, no sooner than 6 hours before the event. It also requires 15-days' notice of the temporary heightened curbside parking fees and their exact duration. Among other things, it removes the cap on the maximum hourly rate the Mayor may set.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement under Other Documents.
Title
Dynamic Performance Parking Zone Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0578 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001122 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0578 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0641 |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-04-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0641 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2020-02-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |