DC B23-0661 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0579 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0579 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-661 requires the Department of General Services to provide the Council with an annual account of green space owned or leased by the District and also requires DGS to include the square footage of green space at a real property in surplus resolutions transmitted to the Council.
Title
Surplus Green Space Retention Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0579 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001126 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0579 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0661 |
2020-09-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0661 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2020-02-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |