DC B23-0665 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0580 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0580 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-665 requires the Department of General Services (DGS) to identify and mitigate environmental hazards that impact human health on playground surface materials as well as all District-owned buildings that are occupied during demolition, excavation, renovation, and construction activities. DGS must publish plans for remediation where an environmental hazard is identified among other things.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement under Other Documents.
Title
Public Facilities Environmental Safety Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - Amendment (R. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - Amendment (R. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0580 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001128 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0580 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | Amendment (R. White) |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading |
2020-11-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0665 |
2020-09-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0665 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2020-02-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |