DC B23-0699 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-699 requires the Mayor to issue a motor vehicle identification tag with the legend "END GUN VIOLENCE".
Provisions incorporated into Bill 23-666.
Title
End Gun Violence Motor Vehicle Identification Tags Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0699 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2020-03-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0699 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44336/Introduction/B23-0699-Introduction.pdf |