DC B23-0717 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0511 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14411
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0511 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14411
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-717 expands equitable access to public charter schools to at-risk students upon approval from the Public Charter School Board.
Title
Expanding Equitable Access to Great Schools Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - Amendment# 2 (Allen/R White) Considered at Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - Amendment (Allen/R White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - Amendment# 2 (Allen/R White) Considered at Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - Amendment (Allen/R White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Council | Act A23-0511 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14411 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0511 |
2020-11-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0717 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Amendment# 2 (Allen/R White) Considered at Committee of the Whole |
2020-10-20 | Council | Amendment # 1 (Allen/R White) Considered at Committee of the Whole |
2020-10-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0717 |
2020-07-31 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-03-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0717 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |