DC B23-0730 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Law L23-0123, Effective from Aug 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11309, Expires on Mar 18, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Law L23-0123, Effective from Aug 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11309, Expires on Mar 18, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms Safety Omnibus Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Firearms Safety Omnibus Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Council | Law L23-0123, Effective from Aug 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11309, Expires on Mar 18, 2021 |
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0315 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5103 |
2020-05-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-05-04 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0315 |
2020-04-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 6, 2020 |
2020-04-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-04-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0730 Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-04-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |