DC B23-0732 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0124, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8984, Expires on Feb 04, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0124, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8984, Expires on Feb 04, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Children's Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Equitable Tax Relief Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Council | Law L23-0124, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8984, Expires on Feb 04, 2021 |
2020-05-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-05-04 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0316 |
2020-04-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 6, 2020 |
2020-04-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-04-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-04-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |