DC B23-0734 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Law L23-0129, Effective from Oct 09, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12235, Expires on May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Law L23-0129, Effective from Oct 09, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12235, Expires on May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19 Response Supplemental Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
COVID-19 Response Supplemental Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Council | Law L23-0129, Effective from Oct 09, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12235, Expires on May 21, 2021 |
2020-07-16 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-06-05 | Council | Act A23-0323 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 6601 |
2020-05-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-05-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0323 |
2020-05-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2020 |
2020-04-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-04-21 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-04-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0734 Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-04-07 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-04-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |