DC B23-0756 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Law L23-0128, Effective from Aug 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10919, Expires on Apr 08, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Law L23-0128, Effective from Aug 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10919, Expires on Apr 08, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Program Patient Employment Protection Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Medical Marijuana Program Patient Employment Protection Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Council | Law L23-0128, Effective from Aug 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10919, Expires on Apr 08, 2021 |
2020-07-17 | Council | Act A23-0333 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8619 |
2020-07-16 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-07-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-07-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0333 |
2020-06-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 7, 2020 |
2020-06-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-06-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-05-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0756 Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-19 | Council | First Reading |
2020-05-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |