DC B23-0759 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Act A23-0328 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7598, Expires on Sep 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Act A23-0328 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7598, Expires on Sep 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus Support Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Coronavirus Support Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Council | Act A23-0328 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7598, Expires on Sep 06, 2020 |
2020-06-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-06-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-08 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0328, Expires on Sep 06, 2020 |
2020-05-26 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 9, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-05-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |