DC B23-0760 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Law L23-0149, Effective from Dec 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14601
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Law L23-0149, Effective from Dec 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14601
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Please see Referral Memo for Subtitle Referrals.
Title
Fiscal Year 2021 Budget Support Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Silverman #2) - As Amended (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Silverman & Nadeau) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Allen #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Allen #1) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) - As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Gray #4) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Gray #3) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Gray #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Gray #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Grosso) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Silverman #2) - As Amended (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Silverman & Nadeau) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Allen #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Allen #1) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) - As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Gray #4) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Gray #3) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Gray #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Gray #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Grosso) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Council | Law L23-0149, Effective from Dec 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14601 |
2020-09-04 | Council | Act A23-0407 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10493 |
2020-09-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-08-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0407 |
2020-08-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 31, 2020 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (T.White) - Oral Amendment Accepted as Friendly |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Silverman #2) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Silverman & Nadeau) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Allen #2) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Allen #1) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (R.White) - Oral Amendment Accepted as Friendly |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) - Oral Amendment Accepted as Friendly |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Bonds) - As Amended |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Gray #5) - Not Considered |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Gray #4) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Gray #3) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Gray #2) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Gray #1) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Grosso) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-07-28 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau and Silverman) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (TWhite) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (R. White) - Not Considered |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Grosso) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Allen #2) - Not Considered |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Allen #1) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0760 |
2020-07-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-07-07 | Council | Oral Amendment (Nadeau) - Not Considered |
2020-06-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0760 Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |