DC B23-0787 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0491 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13911
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0491 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13911
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-787 symbolically designates 16th Street, N.W., between H Street, N.W, and K Street N.W. as Black Lives Matter Plaza.
Title
Black Lives Matter Plaza Designation Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0491 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13911 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0491 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0787 |
2020-09-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0787 Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |