DC B23-0858 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0166, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000740, Expires on Aug 04, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0166, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000740, Expires on Aug 04, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Low Income Housing Tax Credit TOPA Exemption for Transfers of Interest Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Low Income Housing Tax Credit TOPA Exemption for Transfers of Interest Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0166, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000740, Expires on Aug 04, 2021 |
2020-11-06 | Council | Act A23-0448 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13043 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0448 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0858 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-28 | Council | First Reading |
2020-07-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |