DC B23-0869 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus Support Second Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Coronavirus Support Second Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-08-28 | Council | Act A23-0405 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10235, Expires on Nov 16, 2020 |
2020-08-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-19 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0405, Expires on Nov 16, 2020 |
2020-08-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 24, 2020 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |