DC B23-0871 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0168, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000742, Expires on Aug 04, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0168, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000742, Expires on Aug 04, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Businesses and Workers from COVID-19 Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Protecting Businesses and Workers from COVID-19 Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0168, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000742, Expires on Aug 04, 2021 |
2020-11-06 | Council | Act A23-0443 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13025 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-10-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0443 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-09-22 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) - not considered |
2020-09-22 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-09-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0871 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-28 | Council | First Reading |
2020-07-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |