DC B23-0872 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-872 amends the District of Columbia Government Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 1978 to provide for permanent total disability.
Title
Public Sector Workers’ Compensation Permanent Total Disability Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2020-09-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0872 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0872 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45491/Introduction/B23-0872-Introduction.pdf |