DC B23-0874 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 23-874 makes changes to the public sector workers’ compensation system to mirror the private sector workers’ compensation system.
Title
Public Sector Injured Workers’ Equality Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2020-09-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0874 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0874 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45498/Introduction/B23-0874-Introduction.pdf |