DC B23-0878 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 29 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0608 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 29 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0608 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-878 enacts a 2-year moratorium on voluntary agreements between tenants and housing providers including to establish rent ceilings, provide for capital improvements, and alter services.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0608 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001232 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-14 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0608 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0878 |
2020-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0878 |
2020-09-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2020-08-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0878 Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-31 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |