DC B23-0882 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 23-882 establishes comprehensive policing and justice reform for District residents and visitors.
Title
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0882 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0882 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45506/Introduction/B23-0882-Introduction.pdf |