DC B23-0884 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0585 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0585 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-884 extends the District’s time to dispose of real property located at 3012 Georgia Avenue N.W., a portion of the Bruce Monroe site that consists of approximately 77,421 square feet.
Title
Bruce Monroe Extension of Disposition Authority Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0585 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001143 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0585 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0884 |
2020-10-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0884 Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |