DC B23-0887 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-887 requires the installation and maintenance of dispensers for free period products in public and public charter schools.
Title
Expanding Student Access to Period Products Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-11-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0887 Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0887 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45589/Introduction/B23-0887-Introduction.pdf |