DC B23-0902 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 29 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-23 - Act A23-0420 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12263, Expires on Jan 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on September 29 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-23 - Act A23-0420 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12263, Expires on Jan 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Government Grant Transparency Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Government Grant Transparency Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Council | Act A23-0420 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12263, Expires on Jan 12, 2021 |
2020-10-15 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-10-15 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0420, Expires on Jan 12, 2021 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-09-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 14, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-09-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |