DC B23-0940 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 26 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0497 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13949, Expires on Feb 07, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fairness in Renting Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fairness in Renting Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen and Cheh #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen and Cheh #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Council - Amendment (T.White - withdrawn) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-27CouncilAct A23-0497 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13949, Expires on Feb 07, 2021
2020-11-17CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-11-10CouncilEnacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0497, Expires on Feb 07, 2021
2020-10-26CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 9, 2020
2020-10-20CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-10-06CouncilAmendment (Allen and Cheh #2)
2020-10-06CouncilAmendment (Allen and Cheh #1)
2020-10-06CouncilAmendment (T.White) Not Considered
2020-10-06CouncilFinal Reading
2020-10-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback