DC CER23-0020 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Resolution ACR23-0020, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3675
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Resolution ACR23-0020, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3675
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Susan Vener Linsky 70th Birthday Celebration Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Susan Vener Linsky 70th Birthday Celebration Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0020, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3675 |
2019-03-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0020 |
2019-02-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-02-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-02-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |