DC CER23-0026 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Resolution ACR23-0026, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3686
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Resolution ACR23-0026, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3686
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Derek E. Davis, Marsten L. Davis, and Davis Barber Service Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Derek E. Davis, Marsten L. Davis, and Davis Barber Service Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0026, Effective from Mar 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3686 |
2019-03-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0026 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |