DC CER23-0037 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution ACR23-0037, Effective from Apr 12, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4417
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution ACR23-0037, Effective from Apr 12, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4417
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eastern Senior High School Lady Ramblers State Basketball Champions Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Eastern Senior High School Lady Ramblers State Basketball Champions Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0037, Effective from Apr 12, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4417 |
2019-04-12 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0037 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |