DC CER23-0058 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Resolution ACR23-0058, Effective from Apr 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4973
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Resolution ACR23-0058, Effective from Apr 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4973
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Frank R. Williams Scholarship Fund's Annual Two-Mile Fun Walk 10th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Frank R. Williams Scholarship Fund's Annual Two-Mile Fun Walk 10th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0058, Effective from Apr 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4973 |
2019-04-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0058 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |