DC CER23-0073 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Resolution ACR23-0073, Effective from Oct 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13575
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Resolution ACR23-0073, Effective from Oct 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13575
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
15th Anniversary of the Language Access Act of 2004 Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
15th Anniversary of the Language Access Act of 2004 Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0073, Effective from Oct 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13575 |
2019-10-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0073 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-04-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |