DC CER23-0088 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution ACR23-0088, Effective from Oct 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13965
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Resolution ACR23-0088, Effective from Oct 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13965
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
E. Veronica Pace Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
E. Veronica Pace Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0088, Effective from Oct 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13965 |
2019-10-25 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0088 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |