DC CER23-0277 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution ACR23-0277, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9443
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution ACR23-0277, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9443
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reverend Dr. Robert “Bob” Edward Mathieu Ceremonial Resolution of 2020
Title
Reverend Dr. Robert “Bob” Edward Mathieu Ceremonial Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0277, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9443 |
2020-08-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0277 |
2020-03-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-03-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |