DC CER23-0278 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution ACR23-0278, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution ACR23-0278, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Earned Income Tax Credit Day Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit Day Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0278, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9445 |
2020-08-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0278 |
2020-03-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-03-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |