DC CER23-0281 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution ACR23-0281, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9451
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution ACR23-0281, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9451
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia 100th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
League of Women Voters of the District of Columbia 100th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0281, Effective from Aug 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9451 |
2020-08-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0281 |
2020-06-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-06-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |