DC PR22-0838 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-21 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-21 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Board Of Elections Michael Bennett Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
District Of Columbia Board Of Elections Michael Bennett Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0838 |
2018-06-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-04-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0838 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0838 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40109/PR22-0838-Introduction.pdf |