DC PR22-0889 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board Of Trustees Of The University Of The District Of Columbia Elaine Crider Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Board Of Trustees Of The University Of The District Of Columbia Elaine Crider Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0889 Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-06-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0889 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40376/PR22-0889-Introduction.pdf |