DC PR22-0906 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Resolution R22-0567 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Resolution R22-0567 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To approve CA 22-534
Title
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2017-lrsp-01a Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Council | Resolution R22-0567 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8002 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0567 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0906 Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-26 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-06-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |