DC PR22-0987 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Resolution R22-0675 Effective from December 4, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Resolution R22-0675 Effective from December 4, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eastern Branch Boys And Girls Club Surplus Declaration And Approval Resolution Of 2018
Title
Eastern Branch Boys And Girls Club Surplus Declaration And Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | Council | Resolution R22-0675 Effective from December 4, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13448 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0675 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0987 |
2018-11-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0987 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2018-09-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |