DC PR22-1055 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarification Of Hospital Closure Procedure Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Clarification Of Hospital Closure Procedure Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-10-26 | Council | Resolution R22-0630 Effective from October 16, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11877 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0630 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-10-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |