DC PR23-0001 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0001 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0001 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Rules may be accessed from the "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Rules of Organization and Procedure for the Council of the District of Columbia, Council Period 23, Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #2) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #1) (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Gray - #1) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #2) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #3) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #1) (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment - (Gray #2) - not considered (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #1) (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Gray - #1) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #2) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #3) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh - #1) (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-02 - Council - Amendment - (Gray #2) - not considered (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0001 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-11 | Council | Resolution R23-0001, Effective from Jan 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 272 |
2019-01-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0001 |
2019-01-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-01-02 | Council | Amendment - (Gray #2) - not considered |
2019-01-02 | Council | Amendment (Gray - #1) |
2019-01-02 | Council | Amendment (Cheh - #3) |
2019-01-02 | Council | Amendment (Cheh - #2) |
2019-01-02 | Council | Amendment (Cheh - #1) |
2019-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |