DC PR23-0005 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Resolution R23-0005, Effective from Jan 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 402
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Resolution R23-0005, Effective from Jan 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 402
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary to the Council of the District of Columbia Nyasha Smith Reappointment Resolution of 2019
Title
Secretary to the Council of the District of Columbia Nyasha Smith Reappointment Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Resolution R23-0005, Effective from Jan 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 402 |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0005 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0005 |
2019-01-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |