DC PR23-0037 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Resolution R23-0026, Effective from Feb 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2475
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Resolution R23-0026, Effective from Feb 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2475
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed approved 2/22/2019
PREVIOUSLY
PR 22-1082
Title
Commission on Re-Entry and Returning Citizen Affairs Larry Moon Confirmation Resolution of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Council | Resolution R23-0026, Effective from Feb 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2475 |
2019-02-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0026 |
2019-02-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-02-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-02-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0037 |
2019-01-30 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0037 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2019-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |